HI SCR38 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR38
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 957).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 957).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Restaurants To Donate Any Leftover Food To Homeless Shelters At The End Of Their Business Day And Urging The Department Of Health To Develop And Disseminate Temperature Controlled For Safety Food Donation Guidelines.
Title
Urging Restaurants To Donate Any Leftover Food To Homeless Shelters At The End Of Their Business Day And Urging The Department Of Health To Develop And Disseminate Temperature Controlled For Safety Food Donation Guidelines.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 957). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Final Adoption. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-19. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-24-19. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-23-19. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 821). |
2019-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Holt, McDermott, Ohno, Todd excused (5). |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2280), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey. |
2019-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-17-19 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2241) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Friday, 04-12-19 9:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, JUD, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 592) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1751) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 10:35AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR38 (Carry Over) 2019-04-24 - Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 957).