HI SCR54 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR54
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly Urging Various Government Agencies To Take Appropriate Actions To Protect The Wahi Pana Of Waimakaohiiaka And Preserve The Traditional And Customary Practice Of Making Salt Beds And Gathering Paakai (salt) In Hanapepe, Kauai.
Title
Strongly Urging Various Government Agencies To Take Appropriate Actions To Protect The Wahi Pana Of Waimakaohiiaka And Preserve The Traditional And Customary Practice Of Making Salt Beds And Gathering Paakai (salt) In Hanapepe, Kauai.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2020-06-30 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 548) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 06-30-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3706) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 1:16PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL/TRS. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR54 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM.