HI SCR62 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Support Continued Funding For The Congressionally Directed Medical Research Program For Neurofibromatosis.
Title
Neurofibromatosis; Congressionally Directed Medical Research Programs
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 727). |
2013-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1746), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Cabanilla, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Jordan. |
2013-04-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 04-19-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to HLT, referral sheet 52 |
2013-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 436) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-13. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported from HTH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1232) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Tokuda. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred to HTH/TEC. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=62&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR62_.HTM |