HI SCR63 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR63
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 47
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Real Estate Commission To Conduct A Study On The Implementation Of Recommendations Found In The Condominium Governance An Examination Of Some Issues 1989 Report By The Legislative Reference Bureau.
Title
Requesting The Real Estate Commission To Conduct A Study On The Implementation Of Recommendations Found In The Condominium Governance An Examination Of Some Issues 1989 Report By The Legislative Reference Bureau.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 47 |
2019-03-29 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 540). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-19. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1654) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR63 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 47
HCR62 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR62 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Condominium Governance
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Legislative Reference Bureau
Real Estate Commission
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Legislative Reference Bureau
Real Estate Commission