HI SCR67 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Hawaii Agriculture Research Center For Its Benefits To The Agriculture Industry And Urging The Hawaii Agriculture Research Center To Establish The Proposed Kunia Agriculture Processing And Sales Center.
Title
HARC; Kunia; Agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 722). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1826-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-19 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Nishimoto, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka. | |
2012-04-17 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 04-19-12 10:30AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to AGR, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 704) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WLH/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3461) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, Chun Oakland, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-12 2:50PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Re-Referred to WLH/AGL. | |
2012-03-08 | (S) Referred to WLH/EDT/ENE, WAM. | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Offered. |