HI SCR67 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR67
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Endorsing Taiwan's Participation As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Encouraging A U.s.-taiwan Bilateral Trade Agreement; And Celebrating The State Of Hawaii's Twenty-fifth Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan.
Title
Endorsing Taiwan's Participation As An Observer In The United Nations Framework Convention On Climate Change, International Civil Aviation Organization, World Health Organization, And International Criminal Police Organization; Encouraging A U.s.-taiwan Bilateral Trade Agreement; And Celebrating The State Of Hawaii's Twenty-fifth Anniversary Of Sister-state Relations With Taiwan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 512). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3401) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to AEN/JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR67 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to PSM/AEN/HOU, WAM.
HCR59 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR59 (Same As) 2018-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=67&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR67_.HTM |