HI SCR68 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR68
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-16 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Environmental Council To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Revision Of Environmental Impact Statement Rules, Title 11, Chapter 200, Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Title
Requesting The Environmental Council To Submit A Report To The Legislature On The Revision Of Environmental Impact Statement Rules, Title 11, Chapter 200, Hawaii Administrative Rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2003-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cullen, Kong, McKelvey, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Yamane, McDermott. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 04-12-18 11:20AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 51 |
2018-03-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 459). |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-28-183. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3218) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-18 1:50PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN/JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR68 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - The committee(s) on AEN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 03-24-17 1:20PM in conference room 224.
HCR233 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR233 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=68&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR68_.HTM |