HI SCR7 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Committees On Human Services Of The Senate And House Of Representatives To Convene A Working Group To Further Study Family Court Custody Evaluator Standards, Including A Minimum Curriculum, Procedures And Requirements For Appointment, And Other Recommendations.
Title
amily Court Custody Evaluator Working Group; Custody Evaluators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from HMS/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2934), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hemmings. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-30-10 10:05AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to HMS/JGO, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR1 (Same As) 2010-01-29 - (S) Referred to HMS/JGO, WAM.