HI SCR7 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR7
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Human Services, In Consultation With The Department Of Public Safety, To Work With The Family Reunification Working Group And Other Community Stakeholders To Develop A Plan To Establish Visitation Centers At All State Correctional Facilities And Jails.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 817). |
2019-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-18 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Holt, McDermott, Ohno, Todd excused (5). |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2278), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey. |
2019-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-17-19 3:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HSH/PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2242), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno, Ward. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH/PVM on Friday, 04-12-19 9:35AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to HSH/PVM, JUD, referral sheet 47 |
2019-03-29 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 539) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-29-19. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1652) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Reported from HMS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1199), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDC. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Baker. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Riviere. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/PSM, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR7 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.