HI SCR71 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR71
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Executive Office On Early Learning To Examine And Consider A Sliding Scale Tuition Or Fee Schedule For State Pre-kindergarten Programs.
Title
Urging The Executive Office On Early Learning To Examine And Consider A Sliding Scale Tuition Or Fee Schedule For State Pre-kindergarten Programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 603). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, wtih Senator Ihara voting "Aye, with reservations". Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1850) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1622), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR71 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 50
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=71&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR71_.HTM |