HI SCR72 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR72
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to PVM/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to PVM/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Counties To Submit A Report To The Legislature On How Many Vehicle Weight Tax Exemptions Are Claimed By Members Of The National Guard, Military Reserves, And Other Armed Services.
Title
Urging The Counties To Submit A Report To The Legislature On How Many Vehicle Weight Tax Exemptions Are Claimed By Members Of The National Guard, Military Reserves, And Other Armed Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to PVM/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 604) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1822) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1551), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Harimoto. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 3:00PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR72 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to PVM/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 50