HI SCR75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR75
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.
Title
Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 606). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1823) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1599), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR75 (Carry Over) 2019-04-05 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 50
HCR112 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR112 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=75&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR75_.HTM |