HI SCR8 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Hawaii State Department Of The Attorney General To Conduct A Statewide Investigation Of Sexual Abuse Of Minors In The State Of Hawaii By Clergy Of The Roman Catholic Church And Any Other Church Or Institution With Allegations Of Sexual Abuse Of Minors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Hawaii State Department Of The Attorney General To Conduct A Statewide Investigation Of Sexual Abuse Of Minors In The State Of Hawaii By Clergy Of The Roman Catholic Church And Any Other Church Or Institution With Allegations Of Sexual Abuse Of Minors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2235) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 04-12-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 583).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted with Senator Fevella voting "No". Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1808) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted, referred to WAM.
2019-03-01SenateReported from HMS/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 904), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Gabbard.
2019-02-20SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on HMS/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HMS/JDC, WAM.
2019-01-22SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback