HI SCR80 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Conduct Research On The Correlation Between Children Who Are Late-born And Educational Outcomes.
Title
Department of Education; Late-born Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 671). | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Say, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2012-04-24 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1804-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-20 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Belatti, Awana, Hanohano, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Wooley, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Chang, Mizuno, Saiki, Takai, Fontaine. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 04-20-12 3:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2012-04-18 | (H) Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 67 | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 66 | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 707) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) One Day Notice 04-13-12. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3369) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-04-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 04-04-12 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-23 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-30-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-19 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to EDU. | |
2012-03-09 | (S) Offered. |