HI SCR82 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Task Force For The Development Of A Statewide Response System To Assist With Missing Or Lost Senior Citizens And Other Disoriented Adults.
Title
Missing Senior Citizens; System to Locate & Return; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | (S) Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Reported from HMS/JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2932), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-29-10 1:20PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO deferred the measure until 03-30-10 10:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS/JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-10 3:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Referred to HMS/JGO, WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Offered. |