HI SCR86 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR86
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Governor To Recognize And Commemorate August 26, 2020, As Women's Equality Day, Celebrating The Centennial Of, And Honoring Hawaii's Role In, The Women's Suffrage Movement.
Title
Requesting The Governor To Recognize And Commemorate August 26, 2020, As Women's Equality Day, Celebrating The Centennial Of, And Honoring Hawaii's Role In, The Women's Suffrage Movement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2020-06-30 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 551) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 06-30-20. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Reported from GVO/LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3702) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO/LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-20 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to GVO/LCA. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR86 (Carry Over) 2019-04-23 - Resolution adopted in final form.