HI SCR91 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-10 - Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 49
Pending: House Veterans, Military, & International Affairs, & Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress And The President Of The United States To Support The Passage Of Legislation To Expedite Family Reunification For Certain Filipino Veterans Of World War Ii.
Title
Filipino Veterans Family Reunification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 454) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1379) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-15 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to PSM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |