HI SCR91 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR91
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii High School Athletic Association To Adopt The Pitch Smart Guidelines For High School Baseball Pitchers.
Title
Urging The Hawaii High School Athletic Association To Adopt The Pitch Smart Guidelines For High School Baseball Pitchers.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to CPH. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1183), with recommendation of referral to CPH. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Riviere. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to EDU, CPH. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR91 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted, referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=91&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR91_.HTM |