HI SCR92 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Comptroller To Establish A Task Force To Study The State Procurement Code And Identify Amendments That Would Increase Economy, Efficiency, Effectiveness, And Impartiality In The Procurement Of Public Works Construction Projects.
Title
State Procurement Code; Identify Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 773). |
2013-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2013-04-30 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-13. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1783), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Jordan, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward. |
2013-04-26 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-29-13 9:00AM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-18 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 58 |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 54 |
2013-04-12 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 639) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 2). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1515) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Wakai. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH deferred the measure until 04-01-13 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has rescheduled its public hearing to 03-25-13 3:30PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=92&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR92_.HTM |