HI SCR97 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Undertake A Systemwide Review Of Its Oversight, Monitoring, And Accountability Of The Operational And Fiscal Practices Of The Department's School Food Services Branch.
Title
Department of Education; School Food Services Branch
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 775). |
2013-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). |
2013-04-30 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-13. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1781), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-29 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Jordan, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita. |
2013-04-26 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-29-13 9:05AM in conference room 308. |
2013-04-24 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1753), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-04-18 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Choy, Takai, Cheape. |
2013-04-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-04-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 04-18-13 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2013-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 414). |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-13. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1071) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Slom. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 2:05PM in conference room Auditorium. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=97&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SCR97_.HTM |