HI SCR97 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR97
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designating June As Alzheimer's And Dementia Awareness Month In The State Of Hawaii.
Title
Designating June As Alzheimer's And Dementia Awareness Month In The State Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4). |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2248) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-04-11 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Say, Tokioka. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-11-19 9:15AM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-03-19. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1698) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to LCA/CPH. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR97 (Carry Over) 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
HCR212 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR212 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33