HI SR105 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Members Of Hawaii's Congressional Delegation To Support H.r. 208, The National Guardsmen And Reservists Parity For Patriots Act, And S. 644, The National Guard And Reserve Retired Pay Equity Act Of 2009.
Title
National Guard and Reserve; Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-31 | (S) One Day Notice 04-01-10. | |
2010-03-31 | (S) Reported from PSM/TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2942) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Gabbard, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, English, Gabbard, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, Galuteria, Kidani. | |
2010-03-24 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-10 1:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-03-15 | (S) Referred to PSM/TIA. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR207 (Same As) 2010-04-07 - (H) Referred to EBM, FIN, referral sheet 60