HI SR105 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-22 - (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Public Land Development Corporation To Submit A Semi-annual Report To The Legislature And The Board Of Directors Of The Corporation To Submit An Annual Evaluation Of The Executive Director Of The Corporation To The Legislature.
Title
PLDC; Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-22 | (S) Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-19-12. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. | |
2012-04-13 | (S) Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3458) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda, Slom. | |
2012-04-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-12-12 1:25PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-03-16 | (S) Referred to WLH. | |
2012-03-14 | (S) Offered. |