HI SR111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Traumatic Brain Injury; Brain Injury Awareness Month
Title
Traumatic Brain Injury; Brain Injury Awareness Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported from HTH/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1283) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 03-28-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 2:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HTH/TEC. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=111&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR111_.HTM |