HI SR116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Insurance Commissioner To Convene A Working Group To Explore The Use Of Electronic Transmission Of Insurance Notices And Documents.
Title
Insurance Commission; Working Group; Insurance Notices and Documents; Electronic Transmission
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1483) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from TEC/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1124), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Solomon, Slom. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-13 9:45AM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to TEC/CPN, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=116&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR116_.HTM |