HI SR119 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Continental Pacific, Llc, And The State Historic Preservation Division To, Among Other Things, Place An Immediate Stay Of Eviction To Allow Residents Of Kahuku Village To Remain In Their Homes Until An Archaeological Inventory Survey Can Be Completed For The Entire Project And Ensure That The Kahuku Village Project Adheres To All Requirements, Including Requirements For The Treatment Of Burial Remains And For Condominium Property Regimes.
Title
Kahuku village; Stay of Eviction; Archaeological Inventory; Burial Remains
Sponsors
Sen. Clayton Hee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 2). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1507) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-13 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from TEC/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1206), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to JDL. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-13 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to TEC/WTL, JDL. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=119&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR119_.HTM |