HI SR119 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR119
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Study And Make Recommendations On How To Increase Compliance With The Various Requirements For Agricultural Lands And To Prevent Abuse Of Agricultural Land Leases.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture To Study And Make Recommendations On How To Increase Compliance With The Various Requirements For Agricultural Lands And To Prevent Abuse Of Agricultural Land Leases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-19. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1660) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:25PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR119 (Carry Over) 2019-04-01 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR65 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR65 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=119&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR119_.HTM |