HI SR12 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Statewide Service Project To Plant One Million Trees And Clean Beaches Across The State By October 2010, As Part Of The Children And Youth Month Celebration.
Title
Keiki Caucus; Trees; Planting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-20 | (S) One Day Notice 04-21-10. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3213) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-04-15 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Bunda, Fukunaga, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-14 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-10 3:40PM in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to WTL. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Offered. |