HI SR12 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Departments Of Health And Education To Collaborate On Educational Information And Materials About The Human Papillomavirus Vaccine That Can Be Provided To Parents Of Public Middle And Intermediate School Children.
Title
Human Papillomavirus Vaccine; Department of Health; Department of Education; Educational Information and Materials
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3412) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Inouye; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Reported from CPH/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2864), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, K.Kahele, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-02-16 1:25PM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/EDU, WAM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |