HI SR12 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR12
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Identify Barriers To Improving The State's Hiring Processes.
Title
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Identify Barriers To Improving The State's Hiring Processes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3496) with recommendation of adoption. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Galuteria, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:20AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3269), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to LBR, WAM. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR12 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.