HI SR123 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Study The Social, Economic, And Religious Impacts Of Enacting Marriage Equality In Hawaii.
Title
Social, Economic, and Religious Impacts of Enacting Marriage Equality in Hawaii
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Kouchi. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen, Slom). |
2013-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-13 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=123&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR123_.HTM |