HI SR128 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Department Of Health, University Of Hawaii, And Other Relevant State Agencies To Conduct A Statewide Dna Study To Determine Whether Residents Of The State With The Genetic Variant Rs12252-c May Be At A Heightened Risk Of Influenza.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Department Of Health, University Of Hawaii, And Other Relevant State Agencies To Conduct A Statewide Dna Study To Determine Whether Residents Of The State With The Genetic Variant Rs12252-c May Be At A Heightened Risk Of Influenza.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateThe committee on CPH deferred the measure.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee on HRE deferred the measure.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 10:45AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to CPH/HRE, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback