HI SR129 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR129
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Conduct An Analysis And Provide Data On The Number Of Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Beneficiaries Who Have Applied For And Need Housing In Each County, By Income Classification And Unit Type.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Conduct An Analysis And Provide Data On The Number Of Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands Beneficiaries Who Have Applied For And Need Housing In Each County, By Income Classification And Unit Type.
Sponsors
Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-07-08 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3824) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 06-30-20 12:31PM in conference room 016. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 06-25-20 12:32PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 2:15PM in conference room 016. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to HWN. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR129 (Carry Over) 2019-03-13 - Referred to GVO/EDU, WAM.