HI SR13 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-05 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Executive Office On Aging's Efforts To Incorporate A No Wrong Door System Approach Into The Aging And Disability Resource Center Hawaii Network.
Title
The No Wrong Door System Initiative
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-16. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3288) with recommendation of adoption. |
2016-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-24-16 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2921), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Harimoto, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, Slom. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-15-16 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-16 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Offered. |