HI SR133 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Environment, and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Establishment Of A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of Legalizing Sports Gambling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Establishment Of A Task Force To Study The Feasibility Of Legalizing Sports Gambling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateThe committee on EET deferred the measure.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to EET.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR103 (Same As) 2019-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback