HI SR145 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Board Of Education To Review Policy No. 6701 In Light Of The State's Effort To Renovate And Build Twenty-first Century Schools And To Report Its Recommendations To The Legislature.
Title
21ST Century Schools
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1455) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from EDU/EGH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on EGH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EGH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/EGH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-13 1:55PM in conference room Auditorium. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to EDU/EGH, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |