HI SR146 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Supporting The Development Of A Hawaiian Language Plan, Including Goals, Benchmarks, Strategies, And Outcomes, To Build Upon Accomplishments And To Accelerate The Normalization Of olelo Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting The Development Of A Hawaiian Language Plan, Including Goals, Benchmarks, Strategies, And Outcomes, To Build Upon Accomplishments And To Accelerate The Normalization Of olelo Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-11SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2080) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1560), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 03-21-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:18PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HWN, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback