HI SR148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "Aye, with reservations".
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The United States Army Corps Of Engineers, State Of Hawaii, And City And County Of Honolulu To Establish A Working Group To Explore Matters Related To The Ala Wai Watershed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The United States Army Corps Of Engineers, State Of Hawaii, And City And County Of Honolulu To Establish A Working Group To Explore Matters Related To The Ala Wai Watershed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, with Senator Fevella voting "Aye, with reservations".
2019-04-11SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2081) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1616), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-25-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR146 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback