HI SR149 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents To Review And, As Needed, Conform The Classification Of Its Faculty To Ensure Greater Alignment With The Mission And Purpose Of The University And Incorporate The Association Of American Universities' Membership Indicators Into Its Strategic Plan For The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents To Review And, As Needed, Conform The Classification Of Its Faculty To Ensure Greater Alignment With The Mission And Purpose Of The University And Incorporate The Association Of American Universities' Membership Indicators Into Its Strategic Plan For The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2193) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-11SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to HRE.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback