HI SR150 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii At Hilo To Conduct An Outreach Program, Perform A Needs Assessment, And Establish A Higher Education Learning Center In The District Of Puna On The Island Of Hawaii.
Title
Agriculture; Higher Education Learning Center; Puna
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Sam Slom [R] |
Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-07-13. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1485) with recommendation of adoption. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-05-13 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-13 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1205), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ige, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-13 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AGL, WAM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=150&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SR150_.HTM |