HI SR154 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Extension Of Keaunui Drive To Renton Road In Ewa Beach.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Extension Of Keaunui Drive To Renton Road In Ewa Beach.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-24SenateOne Day Notice 04-25-19.
2019-04-24SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2237) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-22SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2019-04-17SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2019-04-16SenateRe-Referred to TRS.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to TRS, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback