HI SR158 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Re-Referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Analysis To Sunrise Analysis: Check Cashing And Deferred Deposit Agreements (payday Loans), Report No. 05-11.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Follow-up Analysis To Sunrise Analysis: Check Cashing And Deferred Deposit Agreements (payday Loans), Report No. 05-11.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to GVO/CPH, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR124 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback