HI SR159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism Convene An International Moon Base Alliance Committee To Provide Recommendations And Guidance For The Development Of Evolvable Lunar Architecture On The Island Of Hawaii.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism Convene An International Moon Base Alliance Committee To Provide Recommendations And Guidance For The Development Of Evolvable Lunar Architecture On The Island Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR159 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - The committee on EET deferred the measure.
HR204 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR204 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=159&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR159_.HTM |