HI SR164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR164
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.
Title
Urging The Establishment Of A Native Hawaiian Intellectual Property Task Force To Develop A Sui Generis Legal System To Recognize And Protect Native Hawaiian Cultural Intellectual Property, Traditional Cultural Expressions, And Genetic Resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from HWN/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1747) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-29-19 9:31AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 016. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to HWN/JDC. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR164 (Carry Over) 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
HR142 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR142 (Same As) 2019-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=164&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR164_.HTM |