HI SR165 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The State Board On Geographic Names To Consult With Community Members Who Have Direct Traditional, Cultural, And Familial Ties To The District Of Puna To Establish Appropriate Names For The Fissure 8 Vent And Other Features Of The 2018 Eruption Of Kilauea Volcano.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The State Board On Geographic Names To Consult With Community Members Who Have Direct Traditional, Cultural, And Familial Ties To The District Of Puna To Establish Appropriate Names For The Fissure 8 Vent And Other Features Of The 2018 Eruption Of Kilauea Volcano.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1801) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to WTL.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR137 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback