HI SR166 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting The United States Postal Service To Issue A Commemorative Postage Stamp In Honor Of Alfred Aholo Apaka.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting The United States Postal Service To Issue A Commemorative Postage Stamp In Honor Of Alfred Aholo Apaka.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateReport and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-26SenateOne Day Notice 04-30-19.
2019-04-26SenateReported from LCA/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2240) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-23SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ihara, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-04-18SenateThe committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, S. Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
2019-04-18SenateThe committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 04-23-19 1:31PM in conference room 312.
2019-04-15SenateThe committee(s) on LCA/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-18-19 2:30PM in conference room 423.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to LCA/HWN.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR136 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback