HI SR173 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report and Resolution Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Supporting The imiloa Astronomy Center In Its Educational Efforts Concerning Resources On Mauna Kea At Hale Pohaku, Encouraging The Transfer Of Education Outreach At Hale Pohaku, Requesting A Report Regarding Restructuring Of The Institute For Astronomy And Mauna Kea Support Services, And Requesting The Contribution Of Financial Capital To Construct The imiloa Uka Facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting The imiloa Astronomy Center In Its Educational Efforts Concerning Resources On Mauna Kea At Hale Pohaku, Encouraging The Transfer Of Education Outreach At Hale Pohaku, Requesting A Report Regarding Restructuring Of The Institute For Astronomy And Mauna Kea Support Services, And Requesting The Contribution Of Financial Capital To Construct The imiloa Uka Facility.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateReport and Resolution Adopted.
2019-04-11SenateOne Day Notice 04-12-19.
2019-04-11SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2084) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Taniguchi.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-01-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-27SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-27SenateReported from WTL/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1637), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Fevella.
2019-03-18SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to WTL/HWN, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

HR41 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback