HI SR198 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-28-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-28 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-28-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing The Senate Special Investigating Committee On Covid-19.
Title
Establishing The Senate Special Investigating Committee On Covid-19.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-28-20. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1), with Senator Taniguchi voting "Aye, with reservations" and Senator Thielen voting "No". |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 1). |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 7 offered. |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Deferred until 05-21-20. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 05-18-20. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Offered. |