HI SR26 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor To Use And Consider Gender Equality When Appointing Judges And Justices To Hawaii Courts.
Title
Judicial Appointments; Gender Equality
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Colleen Hanabusa [D] |
Sen. Gary Hooser [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted as amended (SD 1). Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). | |
2010-04-06 | (S) One Day Notice 04-07-10. | |
2010-04-06 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3066) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-29 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine. | |
2010-03-25 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-10 9:35AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-01-29 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR37 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 63