HI SR26 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The United States Secretary Of Agriculture To Increase The Federal Breakfast, Lunch, And Afterschool Snack Reimbursement Rates For Hawaii.
Title
Federal Meal Subsidies for Public Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06-16-15. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1396) with recommendation of adoption. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-08-15 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 970), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Harimoto, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-15 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=26&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SR26_.HTM |